skip to content

Kerr, Roderick Graham

CPSO#: 26995

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roderick G. Kerr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kerr ( CPSO# 26995 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1131 Nottinghill Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1K5
Phone Number: (905) 815-9090

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021