skip to content

Kerr, Ian Graham

CPSO#: 29931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 May 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 May 1982

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medpoint Health Care Centre
Sifton Centre-West5
1295 Riverbend Road, Suite 200
London ON  N6K 0G2
Phone: (519) 432-1919 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IAN GRAHAM KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1982