skip to content

Kerfoot, Karin Elaine

CPSO#: 96461

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 21 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 21 Sep 2017

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Kerfoot’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Kerfoot engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of a patient, including by: engaging in sexual intercourse, oral sex, and kissing with the patient and engaging in sexual and/or inappropriate communications with the patient, including making sexual and/or inappropriate comments to the patient and sending inappropriate and/or sexual messages and/or photographs to the patient. Dr. Kerfoot engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in violating appropriate doctor-patient boundaries in respect of the patient, including by going out with the patient to restaurants and/or bars and/or nightclubs, shopping with the patient, travelling with the patient, and/or sharing overnight accommodations with the patient. Dr. Kerfoot engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in failing to cooperate with the College investigation and/or being dishonest regarding her conduct involving the patient to the hospital where she practised and/or the College.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 21 Sep 2017


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2017 Active

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)