skip to content

Keresteci, Ara Kapriel

CPSO#: 18532

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Aug 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 14-Nov-2011

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006