skip to content

Kenyon, Cynthia Florence

CPSO#: 28356

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Bellevue Ave
London ON  N6C 4A6 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. F. Kenyon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kenyon ( CPSO# 28356 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital
Room D4 206
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
24 Bellevue Ave
London ON  N6C 4A6
Phone Number: 5197191215

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2022