skip to content

Kentner, Taryn Alexandra

CPSO#: 88453

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519)941-2410 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Taryn Kentner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kentner ( CPSO# 88453 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-0600


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARYN ALEXANDRA KENTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENTNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010