skip to content

Kenshil, Sana

CPSO#: 97387

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 7985555 Ext. 82545
Fax: 613-738-8434 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANA KENSHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENSHIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2012 to 07 May 2012
EL - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
EL - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017