skip to content

Kenny-Scherber, Alyssa Claire

CPSO#: 88913

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Shellington Place
Suite 204, Second Floor
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: 5197596116 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wright Kenny-Scherber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wright ( CPSO# 88907 )
Dr. A. Kenny-Scherber ( CPSO# 88913 )

Business Address:
St. Jospeh's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building, Rm F506
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Crown Point Family Health Team
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Lower Level
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 547-2302

Business Address:
40 Shellington Place
Suite 204
Second Floor
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: 519 759-6116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALYSSA CLAIRE KENNY-SCHERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNY-SCHERBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011