skip to content

Kenny, William Francis

CPSO#: 96869

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Queen's University Wellness Centre 146 Stuart St Kingston, ON K7L 3N6 Tel: (613) 533-2506
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018