Kennah, Michael Lee (CPSO#: 98662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 03 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEE KENNAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2016 to 23 Sep 2016
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017