skip to content

Kendal, David Simon

CPSO#: 21909

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Temmy Latner Centre Palliative Care 60 Murray St Toronto, Ontario M5T 3L9
Date Received: 31 May 2020


Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to: Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care, Mount Sinai Hospital, 60 Murray Street, Toronto, ON, M5T 3L9, Tel: (416) 585-4800, Fax: (416) 586-4804
Date Received: 08 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020