Kenawy, Sally (CPSO#: 99814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2015

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: 905-850-3250
Fax: 905-850-5607
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kenawy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kenawy ( CPSO# 99814 )

Business Address:
Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
Unit 310
8333 Weston Road
Vaughan ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-3250

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2013 to 27 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sally Kenawy may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.