skip to content

Kelly, Sheila Mary

CPSO#: 23511

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 May 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 May 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 SMYTH RD
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Phone: (613) 4081072
Fax: (613) 7378830 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 SMYTH RD
BREAST HEALTH CENTRE
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Canada
Phone: 613 4081072
Fax: 613 7378899
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

501 SMYTH RD
BREAST HEALTH CENTRE
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613 4081072
Fax: 613 7378899
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.M. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kelly ( CPSO# 23511 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
L2117 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 408-1072


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHEILA MARY KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1971