skip to content

Kelly, Francis Bernard

CPSO#: 26963

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2012