skip to content

Kelly, Emily Ruth

CPSO#: 89172

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

98 Shipley St.
Clinton, ON
N0M1L0
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: 519-482-8762
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emily Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kelly ( CPSO# 89172 )

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Business Address:
19 Water Street
St Marys ON  N4X 1B6

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY RUTH KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011