skip to content

Kelly, Adrienne Margaret

CPSO#: 92250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 220
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 450-6105
Fax: (705) 450-6104 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Adrienne M. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kelly ( CPSO# 92250 )

Business Address:
#220-955 Queen St. E.
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C3


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE MARGARET KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 05 Jan 2010
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015