skip to content

Kelkile, Teshome Shibre

CPSO#: 92475

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 09 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014