skip to content

Keith, Brian Reginald

CPSO#: 29718

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1989
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 10 Apr 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001