skip to content

Keir, Michelle Lorraine

CPSO#: 92483

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Catton, Michelle Lorraine (used until: 28 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2014 to 19 Dec 2014
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017