Keilman, Jeffrey Robert (CPSO#: 99674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Av Stillview
Pointe-Claire QC  H9R 2Y2
Phone: 514-630-2225 Ext. 2699

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT KEILMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEILMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Dec 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014