skip to content

Keila, Parambir Singh

CPSO#: 95800

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Emergency Department
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-2825 Ext. 6229 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V5S6
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Belleville General Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hastings Prince Edward Public Healt
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft
Bancroft ON  K0K3E0
Canada
Phone: 613-332-5692
Fax: 613-332-5749
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Parambir S. Keila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Keila ( CPSO# 95800 )

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6

Business Address:
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PARAMBIR SINGH KEILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEILA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013