skip to content

Keil, William Ernest

CPSO#: 14853

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 29 May 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1954
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 May 1987

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Mar 1983
Summary:

 In March 1983, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Keil guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Keil's licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 24 Feb 1987
Hearing Date(s): 14 Mar 1983