skip to content

Keeton, Michael

CPSO#: 28988

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Keeton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 300 581 Argus Road Oakville ON L6J 3J3
Date Received: 30 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Keeton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective Mary 30, 2016:


Dr. Keeton was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Keeton resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)