skip to content

Keen, Jessica Diane

CPSO#: 93574

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: (416) 495-2420 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Keen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keen ( CPSO# 93574 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA DIANE KEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2016