skip to content

Keefer, Christopher

CPSO#: 93010

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R1B5
Canada
Phone: 416 530 6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Keefer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Keefer ( CPSO# 93010 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
ER
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEEFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEEFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013