skip to content

Keays, Melise

CPSO#: 86411

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melise Keays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Keays ( CPSO# 86411 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISE KEAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEAYS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014