skip to content

Keating, Sarah Jane

CPSO#: 32061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: Lazier, Sarah Jane (used until: 15 Aug 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647)-403-8263 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sarah J. Keating Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Keating ( CPSO# 32061 )

Business Address:
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 3G5
Phone Number: (416) 314-4040

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH JANE KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1986