skip to content

Kazmi, Samina

CPSO#: 94241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103B
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 235-3912
Fax: (905) 235-4196 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Samina Kazmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kazmi ( CPSO# 94241 )

Business Address:
103B-712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 235-3912


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Mississippi
USA - Washington
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:16 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Dec 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011 Active
             Dr. Samina Kazmi may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.