skip to content

Kazdan, Jerome Jack

CPSO#: 18106

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Dolutions 28 Eugene St Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Dr S.S. Hershenfeld 240-30 Disera Dr Thornhill ON L4J 0H7
Date Received: 22 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 02 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019