skip to content

Kaye, Valerie Nohel

CPSO#: 90340

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Valerie Kaye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre, P O Box 5010, 800 Commissioners Road East, London, ON, N6A 5W9
Date Received: 02 Aug 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016