skip to content

Kaya, Ebru

CPSO#: 86076

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room NU 9 924
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 2674
Fax: (416) 340-4823 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ebru Kaya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kaya ( CPSO# 86076 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room NU 9 924
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:01 Jun 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 10 Jul 2007
PEAP - CF - Palliative Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 11 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
CF - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015 Active
             Dr. Ebru Kaya may practise medicine independently in medical oncology.