skip to content

Kaushal, Amit

CPSO#: 97520

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
200 Elizabeth Street, Room 8N-861
M5G2C4
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3889
Fax: 416-340-4585 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Kha and Kaushal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kaushal ( CPSO# 97520 )
Dr. L. Kha ( CPSO# 101568)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Section of Cardiothoracic Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 481-6100

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
8N - 861
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMIT KAUSHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUSHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013