skip to content

Kaura, Amit

CPSO#: 94141

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 12 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012