skip to content

Kaur, Raveen

CPSO#: 85755

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Fax: (705) 523-7282 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 746-932 Ext. 3616
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

Central Manitoulin
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Canada
Phone: (705) 377-5311
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

11 Meredith St W
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 368-2300
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

525 Causley St
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Canada
Phone: (705) 356-226
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Canada
Phone: (705) 848-718
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

825 McKinnon Dr
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

421 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (705) 647-8121 Ext. 2511
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

725 Coursol Rd
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3110
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kulwant Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 64274 )
Dr. R. Kaur ( CPSO# 85755 )

Business Address:
1380 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z4
Phone Number: (705) 523-1550


Corporation Name: R. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 64274 )
Dr. R. Kaur ( CPSO# 85755 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Nov 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Oct 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2008 Active
             Dr. Raveen Kaur may practise medicine independently in radiology and diagnostic
            imaging only.