skip to content

Kaur, Navpreet

CPSO#: 88017

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Eugenio Maria De Hostos University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Castle Oaks Medical Centre
Unit 70
225 Castle Oaks Crossing
Brampton ON  L6P 3X3
Phone: (905) 794-4994
Fax: (905) 794-7994 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaur ( CPSO# 88017 )

Business Address:
Castle Oaks Medical Centre
70 - 225 Castle Oaks Crossing
Brampton ON  L6P 3X3
Phone Number: (647) 919-9946

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAVPREET KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011