skip to content

Kaul, William Henry

CPSO#: 27631

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 410
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 884-9601
Fax: (905) 884-5390 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tom Kaul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kaul ( CPSO# 27631 )
Dr. T. Kaul ( CPSO# 82447 )
Dr. E. McCarvill ( CPSO# 88699 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5094

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HENRY KAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1975