skip to content

Katz, Peter Stewart

CPSO#: 28532

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Oct 2004
Summary:

 On October 15, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Katz to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered the 
 following:

1)	That Dr. Katz attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.

2)	The 
 Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Katz pay costs to the College in the amount of 
 	$2,500.00.

3)	The Discipline Committee ordered that the results of this proceeding be recorded 
 on the 	public register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 15, 2004