skip to content

Kathiravelu, Satheesh

CPSO#: 92477

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospitalist Office
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3084 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Satheesh Kathiravelu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kathiravelu ( CPSO# 92477 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospitalist Office
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active
 Dr.  Satheesh  Kathiravelu  may  practise  medicine  independently  in internal
            medicine. 



Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)