skip to content

Kathiravelu, Anusha

CPSO#: 89198

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 5G1
Phone: 705-743-7101
Fax: 705-743-7104 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kathiravelu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kathiravelu ( CPSO# 89198 )

Business Address:
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 743-7101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANUSHA KATHIRAVELU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHIRAVELU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010