skip to content

Katchky, Ryan Noah

CPSO#: 98015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Room B1-186
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 56820
Fax: 519-685-8038 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

34 Kern Road, Unit 5
North York ON  M3B1T1
Canada
Phone: 4164959902
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan Katchky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Katchky ( CPSO# 98015 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
Room B1-186
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: 519-685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN NOAH KATCHKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATCHKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017