skip to content

Kaster, Tyler

CPSO#: 102981

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tyler Kaster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kaster ( CPSO# 102981)

Business Address:
1001 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Mood and Anxiety
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Business Address:
C A M H
1025 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TYLER KASTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019