skip to content

Kassel, Edward Earl

CPSO#: 24734

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edward Kassel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020