skip to content

Kassas, Emad

CPSO#: 89909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ProMedica Pediatrics & Adolescent C
358 E. Chicago Street, Suite B
Coldwater MI  49036
United States
Phone: (517) 279-5252
Fax: (517) 279-5253

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Ave
NICU Department
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577 Ext. 55526
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emad Kassas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kassas ( CPSO# 89909 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Suite 210
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Phone Number: (519) 255-9991


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:06 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011 Active
 Dr.  Emad  Kassas  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Paediatrics  and
            Neonatology, only.


Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)