skip to content

Kassarjian, Ara

CPSO#: 89766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
6707 Elbow Dr. SW
Calgary AB  T2V 0E3
Phone: (403)777-3000
Fax: (403)777-3008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARA KASSARJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSARJIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2019