skip to content

Kassam, Tasneem Mohamed

CPSO#: 84669

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Health Centre
2nd Floor
521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone: (416) 694-1400
Fax: (416) 694-1985 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tasneem Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kassam ( CPSO# 84669 )

Business Address:
Victoria Health Centre
2nd Floor
521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone Number: (416) 694-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TASNEEM MOHAMED KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008