skip to content

Kassam, Naila Azra

CPSO#: 98253

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Karim, Naila Azra (used until: 21 May 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1240 Bay St
9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 969-3260
Fax: (416) 971-7718 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1240 Bay Street
9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5R2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 971-7601
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

302-790 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 585-9555
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A & N Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kassam ( CPSO# 98253 )
Dr. A. Kassam ( CPSO# 104966)

Business Address:
Runnymede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAILA AZRA KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014