skip to content

Kasravi, Neema

CPSO#: 86785

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (647) 748-6155
Fax: (647) 748-6255 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neema Kasravi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kasravi ( CPSO# 86785 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (647) 748-6155

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEEMA KASRAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASRAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012