skip to content

Kasmani, Tahseen Shakoor

CPSO#: 96896

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102-2251 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2P5
Phone: 18774069362 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Talha Ghadai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ghadai ( CPSO# 85821 )
Dr. T. Kasmani ( CPSO# 96896 )

Business Address:
3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough ON  M1P 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 792-2654

Business Address:
186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa ON  L1J 5Y2
Phone Number: (905) 576-5181

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAHSEEN SHAKOOR KASMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2014 to 03 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2016 to 06 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016