skip to content

Kasianik, Larissa

CPSO#: 85737

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Khabarovsk State Medical Institute, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5460 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 6K7
Phone: 416-250-5400
Fax: 416-250-5461 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kasianik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kasianik ( CPSO# 85737 )

Business Address:
5460 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: 416-250-5400

Business Address:
Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-6752

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LARISSA KASIANIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASIANIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008