skip to content

Kashgary, Abdullah Yousif A

CPSO#: 88227

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Abdulaziz university Hospital
Jeddah 21421
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966535358575

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH YOUSIF A KASHGARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHGARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012